Andy's Music, Inc. v. Andy's Music, Inc.

Plaintiff: Andy's Music, Inc.
Defendant: Andy's Music, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00463
Filed: August 7, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Trademark Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:44 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 20 CORRECTED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, correcting 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. That portion of the Report and Recommendation (Doc. 17) that recommends a dismissal of Plaintiffs claims to be WITH PREJUDICE is corrected to recommend instead that Plaintiffs claims be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of personal jurisdiction.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/15/09. (cmj)
March 16, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, correcting 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. That portion of the Report and Recommendation (Doc. 17) that recommends a dismissal of Plaintiffs claims to be WITH PREJUDICE is corrected to recommend instead that Plaintiffs claims be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of personal jurisdiction. Objections to R&R due by 3/30/2009.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/13/09. (cmj)
February 26, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, recommmending that the motion be granted. Objections to R&R due by 3/12/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 2/26/09. (cmj) (Corrected at doc. 20)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andy's Music, Inc. v. Andy's Music, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy's Music, Inc.
Represented By: Larry Wayne Brantley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy's Music, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?