Williams v. Le Crewe De Spaniards et al

Plaintiff: Naomi Williams
Defendant: Le Crewe De Spaniards and The Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States, Post Number 5660
Case Number: 1:2008cv00506
Filed: August 28, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Accomodations Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1981 Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b). Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/6/10. (tgw)
April 20, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice as set out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/20/10. (tgw)
October 20, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Motion for Summary Judgment. The motion is denied without prejudice to VFW's ability to file a second such motion at an appropriate time. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 10/20/09. (tgw)
January 23, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING (IN PART) 39 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Department of Alabama Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States. The motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. Because the Department is not a defendant, it c annot be properly served with process. Accordingly, its alternate motion to quash service of process as to it is GRANTED. The R&R is ADOPTED except to the extent it recommends that the motion to dismiss be granted. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 1/23/09. (srr)
January 6, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Department of Alabama Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States. It is recommended that the motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, to quash filed by the Department of Alabama Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States (Doc. 30) be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 1/21/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 1/6/09. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Le Crewe De Spaniards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Williams
Represented By: Algernon Johnson Cooper, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Le Crewe De Spaniards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States, Post Number 5660
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?