Rhodes v. Paul & Linda Davis, et al.

Plaintiff: Dustin Ray Rhodes
Defendant: Paul & Linda Davis and BAMACO
Case Number: 1:2008cv00523
Filed: September 15, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2010 128 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that JUDGMENT be and is hereby entered in favor defendant, Bamaco, Inc., and against plaintiff, Dustin Ray Rhodes. Therefore, all plaintiff's claims against the defendant are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. In accordance with the court's order entered on October 25, 2010 (Doc. 127 ), plaintiff is awarded EIGHTY-EIGHT THOUSAND SEVEN HUNDRED TWENTY-TWO AND 50/100 DOLLARS in attorney's fees and SEVEN THOUSAND ONE HUNDRED THIRTY-FIVE AND 53/100 DOLLARS for costs. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/29/2010. (mab)
October 25, 2010 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 113 motion to alter this court's summary judgment order; granting plaintiff's motion for sanctions to the extend that the plaintiff is awarded a total of $88,722.50 for attorney's fees and $7, 135.53 for costs; and finding as moot Bamaco's 121 motion to strike portions of Chase Dearman's affidavit, and plaintiff's motions to strike portions of Michael D. Knight's affidavit (Doc. 124 & 126 ). Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/25/2010. (mab)
May 6, 2010 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Bamaco's 72 Motion for Summary Judgment as set out. Plf's 84 Motion to Preclude Bamaco's use of the workers' compensation insurance policy is DENIED as set out. Plf's 94 , 95 Motions to Preclude use of the MWCC documents are DENIED as set out. Bamaco's 89 Motion to Strike portions of Suzanne Thompson's affidavit & Plf's 98 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Preclude Bamaco's Response are MOOT as set out. Any submission by Plf in regard to sanctions under Rule 37, FRCP, should be filed NLT 5/28/10 as set out. Response may be filed by Dft NLT 6/11/10 & reply NLT 6/18/10. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/6/10. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhodes v. Paul & Linda Davis, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul & Linda Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAMACO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Ray Rhodes
Represented By: Henry Chase Dearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?