Pettway v. Equifax Credit Information Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Paula Pettway
Defendant: Equifax Credit Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and DirecManagement, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00618
Filed: October 22, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Consumer Credit Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2010 109 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered that plaintiff's claims against defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/12/2010. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
November 25, 2009 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered that the motion for enforcement of settlement agreement 88 is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/24/09. (mca)
January 6, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's state law claims without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 1/5/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pettway v. Equifax Credit Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Pettway
Represented By: Earl P. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Credit Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DirecManagement, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?