Padgett v. Washington County Court, 1st Judicial District et al

Plaintiff: Gary E. Padgett
Defendant: Washington County Court, 1st Judicial District, District Attorney Walker, Ben Kelly and State of Alabama Division of Risk Management
Case Number: 1:2008cv00625
Filed: October 24, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 Complaint filed by Gary E. Padgett, recommending that this action be dismissed with prejudice as frivolous, prior to service of process.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/2/09. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
October 27, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 Complaint filed by Gary E. Padgett, recommending that this action be dismissed with prejudice as frivolous, prior to service of process. Objections to R&R due by 11/20/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/27/09. (cmj)
January 5, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion for Reconsideration re 6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has established that he is unable to pay the filing fee, thus his motion to proceed without prepayment of fees and costs, as supplemented by his motion for reconsideration is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/5/09. (copy of order to plaintiff) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padgett v. Washington County Court, 1st Judicial District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary E. Padgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County Court, 1st Judicial District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Attorney Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama Division of Risk Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?