Johnson v. East Bay Kia, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Charlie L. Johnson
Defendant: East Bay Kia, Inc., Smart Automotive Group, LLC and Fifth Third Bank
Case Number: 1:2008cv00656
Filed: November 7, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 28 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims in this matter are DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE. Each party to bear his/its own costs. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/10/2011. (tot)
April 2, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Dft East Bay Kia, Inc.'s 15 Motion for Reconsideration & AMENDING 14 Order to state that Plf Charles L. Johnson is ORDERED to initiate arbitration proceedings & is further ORDERED to provide the court w/a status report of the arbitration proceedings at 90-day intervals beginning on 5/5/09. Plf is ORDERED to advise the court of the termination or other completion of the arbitration proceedings w/i 10 days of the termination or completion. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/2/09. (tot)
February 4, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 11 Motion to Stay Proceedings & to Compel Arbitration as set out. This action is STAYED pending further order of the court. Dfts East Bay Kia, Inc. & Fifth Third Bank are ORDERED to initiate arbitration proceedings & advise the cou rt of the status of arbitration proceedings at 90-day intervals, beginning 5/5/09. Dfts are also ORDERED to advise the court w/i 10 days of the termination or other completion of the arbitration proceedings. The clerk is directed to place this case on the administrative docket. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/4/09. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. East Bay Kia, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie L. Johnson
Represented By: Earl P. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Bay Kia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smart Automotive Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?