United States of America v. Good

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Shane Good
Case Number: 1:2008mc00022
Filed: November 12, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Taxes Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE - It is ORDERED that the 15 Notice is GRANTED such that the United States' action against Shane Good is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/17/2011. Copies to parties. (sdb)
February 20, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion to Amend. The only change to the previous order is the location of the interview. Shane Good is to appear at the Daphne Municipal Courthouse 2/27/09 at 11:00 as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/19/09. (copy mailed) (cmj)
January 14, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America and enforcing the IRS Summons. SHANE GOOD shall appear in person before IRS Revenue Officer Richard Wilder, or any other officer designated by the IRS, at the follo wing location: IRS Office - 1110 Montlimar Drive, Room300, Mobile, Alabama on Friday, February 27, 2009, at 11:00 a.m., Agent Richard Wilder251/341-5923 at which time Respondent shall comply fully with the Summons and produce books, papers, records, or other requested information, or give testimony in accordance with the summons. The United States Marshal's Service shall serve Respondent with a copy of this Order within 30 days. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/14/09. (copy mailed to Respondent, copy to USM and email to USM) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Charles Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?