Baker v. Chertoff
Plaintiff: Timothy Peter Baker
Defendant: Michael Chertoff
Case Number: 1:2009cv00036
Filed: January 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order entered directing the Clerk to transfer Notice of Appeal to the Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/18/09. Certified copy of docket sheet, Notice of Appeal, R&R, Order, and Judgment forwarded to Federal Circuit this date. Copy of order mailed to Timothy Baker. (jlr)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 JUDGMENT that Dft's 7 Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED, & this action is DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE as this Court lacks subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/11/09. (copy mailed to Plf on 6/11/09) (tot)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Dft's 7 MOTION to Dismiss be GRANTED, & that this action be DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE as this Court lacks subject-matter jurisdiction as set out. Objections to R&R due by 6/9/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/26/09. (copy mailed to Plf on 5/26/09) (tot)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING Plf's 21 Motion for Summary Judgment as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/18/09. (copy mailed to Plf on 5/19/09) (tot)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Chertoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Peter Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Chertoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?