Thomas v. Giles

Petitioner: Demarco T. Thomas
Respondent: J. C. Giles
Case Number: 1:2009cv00047
Filed: January 23, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT 32 AND RECOMMENDATION re: 29 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis (with Prisoner Account Statement)by Demarco T. Thomas TO DENY MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/8/09. Copies to parties & Eleventh Circuit. (mpp)
September 4, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 29 TO DENY MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Demarco T. Thomas. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/4/09. ref. Judge Granade (jal) (Clerk mailed copy to Demarco Thomas.
July 20, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that Pet's request for habeas corpus relief be denied as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/20/09. (copy mailed to Pet on 7/22/09) (tot)
July 1, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Pet's rights were not violated in this cause & that his request for habeas corpus relief should be denied as set out. Objections to R&R due by 7/22/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/1/09. (copy mailed to Pet on 7/2/09) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Demarco T. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. C. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?