Wachovia Bank, National Association v. Horizon Wholesale Foods, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Wachovia Bank, National Association
Defendant: Horizon Wholesale Foods, LLC, Warren Day, Leonard L. Gilbert and Jeffrey F. Parr
Case Number: 1:2009cv00072
Filed: February 13, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Negotiable Instrument Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 32 MOTION relief from Judgment filed by Jeffrey F. Parr, Leonard L. Gilbert, Horizon Wholesale Foods, LLC, Warren Day. Additional briefing due by 9/15/2011 from defendants; plaintiff to file any reply by 9/29/2011.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/8/2011. (Order also mailed certified, return receipt, restricted delivery. Mark Upton added as to CM/ECF. (Jonathon Law 70092820000109632324) (Mark Upton 70092820000109632331) (cmj)
December 8, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Wachovia Bank, National Association against Horizon Wholesale Foods, LLC, Jeffrey F. Parr, Leonard L. Gilbert, Warren Day. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/8/09. (cmj)
October 23, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for Summary Judgment as set out. Wachovia is hereby GRANTED LEAVE to supplement the record with evidence of the reasonableness of its claim for attorneys fees and related expenses on or before November 2, 2009. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/23/09. Copies to parties. (mpp)
March 23, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for plaintiff to supplement its complaint to identify the members of Horizon Wholesale Foods LLC along with their respective citizenship. ( Response to order deadline set for 4/3/2009.). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/23/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wachovia Bank, National Association v. Horizon Wholesale Foods, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wachovia Bank, National Association
Represented By: Rashad L. Blossom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Wholesale Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard L. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey F. Parr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?