Synthes USA Sales, LLC v. Hancock

Plaintiff: Synthes USA Sales, LLC
Defendant: Laura Hancock
Case Number: 1:2009cv00082
Filed: February 17, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Laura Hancock, recommending that the motion to dismiss be denied. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/9/09. (cmj)
June 22, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Laura Hancock, recommending that the motion to dismiss be denied as set out. Objections to R&R due by 7/7/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/22/09. (cmj)
March 17, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for plaintiff to supplement its complaint to identify the members of Synthes USA Sales LLC, along with their respective citizenship. ( Supplement deadline set for 3/30/2009.). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/16/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synthes USA Sales, LLC v. Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synthes USA Sales, LLC
Represented By: Samantha H. Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?