Carter et al v. The Vessel Beacon

Plaintiff: Jim Carter and John Lapointe
Defendant: The Vessel Beacon
Case Number: 1:2009cv00117
Filed: March 6, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Marine Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1333 Admiralty

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 58 Motion of Vicker, Riis, Murray and Curran to Intervene with Respect to Recovery of Certain Attorney's Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 04/13/2010. (mab)
January 19, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion for Summary Judgment as set out - Jemison is entitled to judgment in the amount of $18,425.35, plus prejudgment interest at 6% per annum from January 1, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/19/2010. Copies to parties. (mpp)
November 24, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiffs' 29 Motion to Compel without prejudice to the right of plaintiffs to bring such a motion again with an appropriate certification of conferencing efforts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/23/2009. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter et al v. The Vessel Beacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Carter
Represented By: Roy Wallace Harrell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lapointe
Represented By: Roy Wallace Harrell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vessel Beacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?