Frazier v. Shelton and Tyrone Powe Logging et al
Plaintiff: Leo Frazier
Defendant: Shelton and Tyrone Powe Logging, Shelton Powe, Tyrone Powe, David McDonald and Alabama River Woodlands, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00119
Filed: March 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER re: 106 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal w/Prejudice. All claims in this matter are DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE. Each party to bear his/its own costs. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/24/10. (tot)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting in part and mooting in part defendant's 93 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 03/12/2010. (mab)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING Plf's 90 Motion to Amend Complaint as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/25/10. (tot)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER striking defendants' 62 Motion to Compel Discovery for failure to comply with the good faith conferencing requirement of Rule 37. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/02/2009. (mab)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER, Plf's 39 Motion to Dismiss Alabama River Woodlands, Inc. w/Prejudice is GRANTED as set out, & Alabama River Woodlands, Inc.'s 30 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is MOOT as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/10/09. (tot)
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as the opinion of this court; therefore, the 14 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand is hereby DENIED. The motions which are Documents 24 and 25 are also DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 06/03/2009. (mab)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, recommending that 14 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand This Action to the Circuit Court of Clarke County, Alabama be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 6/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 05/18/2009. (mab)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier v. Shelton and Tyrone Powe Logging et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Frazier
Represented By: George Marc Keahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelton and Tyrone Powe Logging
Represented By: Kenneth A. Hitson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelton Powe
Represented By: Kenneth A. Hitson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyrone Powe
Represented By: Kenneth A. Hitson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David McDonald
Represented By: Kenneth A. Hitson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama River Woodlands, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth A. Hitson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?