Muhammad v. Option One

Trustee: John C. McAleer, III
Appellant: Bernice Muhammad
Appellee: Option One Mortgage
Case Number: 1:2009cv00148
Filed: March 18, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Bankruptcy Appeal (801) Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 25 Motion for Reconsideration as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/22/2014. (copy mailed to Debtor/Appellant on 9/23/14) (tot)
July 7, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Debtor/Appellant Muhammad's 23 Motion for Relief from Judgment and Orders as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/7/2014. (copy mailed to Debtor/Appellant on 7/7/14) (tot)
October 12, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/12/10. (copy mailed to Plf on 10/13/10) (tot)
October 7, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Debtor/Appellant's 17 Motion to Compel Bankruptcy Court Records as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/7/10. (copy mailed to Debtor/Appellant on 10/8/10) (tot)
September 22, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Order DENYING Debtor/Appellant's 15 MOTION for Recusal & Disqualification as set out. Appellant is to file her brief on or before 10/6/2010 as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/22/10. (copy mailed to Debtor/Appellant on 9/22/10) (tot)
September 16, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Debtor/Appellant's 13 Motion for Recusal & Disqualification as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/16/10. (copy mailed to Debtor/Appellant on 9/16/10) (tot)
September 2, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 7 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Bernice Muhammad, 9 MOTION to Compel filed by Bernice Muhammad. Motion for Extension of Time is MOOT as set out. Appellant's Brief due by 9/17/2010. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/2/10. (copy mailed to Debtor/Appellant on 9/3/10) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad v. Option One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: John C. McAleer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Bernice Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Option One Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?