Center Capital Corporation v. Q.E.S.T., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Center Capital Corporation
Defendant: Q.E.S.T., Inc., Chris Collum and Tim Phillips
Case Number: 1:2009cv00157
Filed: March 23, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT is entered against Defendant Tim Phillips and in favor of Plaintiff Center Capital Corporation, in the amount of $164,155.91 in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 55(b)(2). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/15/12. copy of order and jgmt mailed to Tim Phillips at 6710 Jimmy Sellers Road, Brewton, AL 36426. (sdb)
December 13, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court Order REINSTATING this case against defendant Tim Phillips as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/13/2011. (copy mailed certified mail to Tim Phillips 70111570000211906265) (cmj)
August 20, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Center Capital Corporation against Q.E.S.T., Inc.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/20/09. (cmj)
August 11, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion for Default Judgment. Default judgment is entered against Defendant Q.E.S.T., and in favor of Plaintiff,in the amount of $379,974.00 (consisting of the principal amount of $354,155.91 , pre-judgment interest from January 15, 2009 at the per diem rate of $174.65 ($23,228.45), and accrued late fees totaling $2,409.64) for Defendant Q.E.S.T., Inc.s failure to plead or otherwise defend this action. Plaintiffs motion with regard to the requests for repossession charges and attorneys fees and court costs is DENIED.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/10/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center Capital Corporation v. Q.E.S.T., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center Capital Corporation
Represented By: Holly Lynn Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q.E.S.T., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Collum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?