Tate v. Rockford
Plaintiff: Lee Curtis Tate
Defendant: Officer Rockford, Officer Lang and Lt. English
Case Number: 1:2009cv00268
Filed: May 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Bert W. Milling
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING 38 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 37 to Deny the MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Lee Curtis Tate, and the Court directs the Comm. of ADOC to withdraw 20% of the prisoner's account to the USDC monthly to pay the appeal filing fee, as further sets out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/18/2011. (copy of the R&R, this Order, to the following as directed: ADOC, Bus. Mgr. of Appellant's Prison at St. Clair Correctional Facility, Springville, AL, and copies to Appellant, Finance) (jal)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 37 to Deny the MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Lee Curtis Tate, and the Court directs the Comm. of ADOC to withdraw 20% of the prisoner's account to the USDC monthly to pay the appeal filing fee, as further sets out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 5/17/2011. (copy to Appellant) (jal)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ADOPTING the 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's complaint be and is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/15/2011. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order re: 24 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Lee Curtis Tate. The Magistrate Judge's order 21 denying the plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel is affirmed. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/2/10. Copy mailed to Plaintiff (tgw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tate v. Rockford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Curtis Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Rockford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?