Charter Services, Inc. v. D.L. Air, LLC
Plaintiff: Charter Services, Inc.
Defendant: D.L. Air, LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv00281
Filed: May 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER entered granting in part and moot in part 30 Motion for Summary Judgment as follows: Defendants motion for summary judgment as to Count One (Breach of Contract) is MOOT only as to Defendants Central Progressive Bank, Blossman Bancshares and Blossman; Defendants motion for summary judgment as to Count Two (Breach of Guarantee) as to all of the Defendants is MOOT; Defendants motion for summary judgment as to Counts Three and Four (Piercing the Corporate Veil/Alter Ego) is GRANTED; and Defendants motion for summary judgment as to Count Five (Promissory Fraud) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/7/2010. (mca) Modified on 5/7/2010 (mca).
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ADOPTING 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Blossman Bancshares, Inc., Central Progressive Bank and 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richard Blossman. The defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint is DENIED as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/2/09. Copies to parties on 11/3/09. (mpp)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Blossman Bancshares, Inc., Central Progressive Bank and 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richard Blossman, recommending that the defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 10/29/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/14/09. (cmj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charter Services, Inc. v. D.L. Air, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charter Services, Inc.
Represented By: April M. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.L. Air, LLC
Represented By: Clifton Charles Mosteller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?