White v. Thyssenkrupp Steel USA , LLC

Plaintiff: Regina White
Defendant: Thyssenkrupp Steel USA , LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv00286
Filed: May 22, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2010 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the defendant's 71 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying plaintiff's 75 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 84 Motion to Strike ; denying 93 Motion to Strike ; denying 104 Motion to Strike. Judgment shall be entered accordingly by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/13/10. (tgw)
May 20, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 66 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Thyssenkrupp Steel USA, LLC stating the Magistrate Judge's order awarding fees and expenses is affirmed as set out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/20/2010. Copies to parties on 5/21/10. (mpp)
February 18, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 39 Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Order, Doc. 38 filed by Thyssenkrupp Steel USA, LLC. The defendant appeals only the sanctions component of the order. The Court cannot determine the basis of the Magistrate Judge's awar d of sanctions and cannot determine whether the award was clearly erroneous or contrary to law. Pursuant to Local Rule 72.3(e), this matter is remanded to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. The 50 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief is denied as moot. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 2/18/10. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Thyssenkrupp Steel USA , LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina White
Represented By: Ronnie L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thyssenkrupp Steel USA , LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?