McConico v. Culliver et al

Petitioner: James McConico, Jr.
Respondent: Grantt Culliver, Troy King and Richard Allen
Case Number: 1:2009cv00322
Filed: June 8, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; denying 43 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 46 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; adopting Report and Recommendations re 47 Report and Recommendation. The Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge made under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(l)(B) is ADOPTED as the opinion of this Court. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/1/10. (copy mailed to Appellant, e-mailed USCA) (jal)
March 31, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 42 TO DENY MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by James McConico, Jr., 46 TO DENY MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by James McConico, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 3/31/10., ref. Judge Granade (Clerk mailed copy to Appellant) (jal)
October 5, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Respondent Grantt Culliver & against Petitioner James McConico, Jr. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/5/09. (copy mailed to Pet on 10/5/09) (tot)
September 24, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that this 8 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be denied, that this action be dismissed, & that judgment be entered in favor of Respondent & against Petitioner. Objections to R&R due by 10/15/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 9/24/09. (copy mailed to Pet on 9/25/09) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McConico v. Culliver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James McConico, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Grantt Culliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Troy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?