Smith et al v. First American Mortgage Trust

Plaintiff: Donald E. Smith and Karen L. Smith
Defendant: First American Mortgage Trust, 1st Continental Mortgage, Inc., REO LAND SERVICES, INC. and M&T BANK
Case Number: 1:2009cv00381
Filed: July 6, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court Order stating First American is GRANTED LEAVE to file separate SUPPLEMENTS to both its Renewed Motion for Default Judgment (Doc. 81) and Petition for Damages, Attorney Fees and Costs (Doc. 59), on or before September 28, 2010 as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/14/10. Copies to parties. (mpp)
April 20, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered that is ORDERED that all of pltfs' claims against defts M&T and First American as well as all of deft M&T's claims against pltfs, are hereby dismissed with prejudice from the active docket of this Court subject to the right of any party to reinstate the action within 180 days of the date of this Order should the settlement agreement not be consummated. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/20/2010. (mca)
January 14, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT - It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that REO Land Services, Inc. shall defend and indemnify First American Mortgage Trust a/k/a, d/b/a NXTLOAN.COM, Corp. for all of the claims asserted in this action against First American. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/14/2010. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. First American Mortgage Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald E. Smith
Represented By: Earl P. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen L. Smith
Represented By: Earl P. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Mortgage Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1st Continental Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REO LAND SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&T BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?