New Hampshire Insurance Company v. Wiregrass Construction Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: New Hampshire Insurance Company
Defendant: Wiregrass Construction Company, Inc. and James Cooper
Case Number: 1:2009cv00489
Filed: July 31, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 71 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply; denying 73 Supplemental Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/20/2011. (tgw)
August 23, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Motion to Strike Jury Demand. The defendant's jury demand is stricken. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/23/10. (tgw)
May 20, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction & denying 31 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/20/10. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Hampshire Insurance Company v. Wiregrass Construction Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Hampshire Insurance Company
Represented By: Blane H. Crutchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiregrass Construction Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?