Mahan v. Mobile Housing Board
Plaintiff: Elaine Mahan
Defendant: Mobile Housing Board
Case Number: 1:2009cv00535
Filed: August 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER ADOPTING 58 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 54 TO DENY MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Elaine Mahan Objections to R&R due by 4/28/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 4/14/11, and DENYING 54 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/2/11. (Copy to Appellant, e-mailed to USCA) (jal)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 JUDGMENT entered in favor of the defendant, Mobile Housing Board, as to all of the Plaintiff's claims. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/22/2011. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 39 defendant Mobile Housing Board's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/19/2011. (srr)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ADOPTING 28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION entered re 24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mobile Housing Board. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Defendant's 24 Motion to dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/12/10. copy to plf. (sdb)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADOPTING 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mobile Housing Board, stating the motion iis GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff is granted leave to amend her Complaint on or before March 4, 2010 as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/11/10. Copies to parties. (mpp)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mobile Housing Board, recommending that this motion be granted, that Plaintiff's claims be dismissed without prejudice and that Plaintiff be granted leave to amend her complaint. Objections to R&R due by 1/4/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/17/09. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahan v. Mobile Housing Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Mahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Housing Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?