Coby v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Ronnie Stevens Coby
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2009cv00544
Filed: August 21, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that this action be reversed & remanded to the SSA for further administrative proceedings as set out, & that a final judgment be entered ordering remand in this action as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/3/10. Copies mailed. (sdb)
June 2, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that this action be reversed & remanded to the SSA for further administrative proceedings as set out, & that a final judgment be entered ordering remand in this action as set out. Objections to R&R due by 6/16/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 6/1/10. (copy mailed to Plf on 6/3/10) (tot)
December 4, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as the opinion of this Court, and denying Defendant's 12 MOTION to Dismiss. This action will proceed to an adjudication of the merits. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/4/2009. (mab)
November 12, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Dft's 12 MOTION to Dismiss be denied, & that this action be allowed to proceed to an adjudication of the merits. Objections to R&R due by 12/3/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 11/12/09. (copy mailed to Plf on 11/13/09) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coby v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Stevens Coby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?