Catledge v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Tommie L. Catledge
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2009cv00606
Filed: September 17, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 22 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Tommie L. Catledge. This motion is granted and plaintiff's counsel is to receive attorneys fees in the amount of $866.18. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/28/2010. (cmj)
December 10, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 22 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Tommie L. Catledge, recommending this motion be granted and that plaintiff's counsel receive attorneys fees in the amount of $866.18. Objections to R&R due by 12/27/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/9/2010. (cmj)
August 13, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Tommie L. Catledge. It is RECOMMENDED that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security denying plaintiff's benefits be REVERSED and the case REMANDED for further proceeding not inconsistent with this decision. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/13/2010. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Catledge v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommie L. Catledge
Represented By: Colin Edward Kemmerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?