Parsons & Whittemore Enterprises Corporation v. Cello Energy, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Parsons & Whittemore Enterprises Corporation
Defendant: Cello Energy, LLC, Boykin Trust, LLC, Vesta Venture, LLC, Forest Technologies, LLC, Jack W. Boykin, Lois Anne Cowin Boykin, Allen W. Boykin and Elisa Rambo Boykin
Case Number: 1:2009cv00631
Filed: September 25, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2011 193 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Forest Technologies, and against Parsons & Whittemore Enterprises Corporation. Forest Technologies' costs are to be taxed against the plaintiff. Plaintiff's claims against Vesta Venture, LLC and Elisa Boyki n are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear her or its own costs. JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Parsons & Whittemore Enterprises Corporation, against Cello Energy, LLC, Boykin Trust, Allen Boykin, Jack Boykin and Lois Boykin, jointly and severally. Parsons & Whittemore Enterprises is awarded a net total amount of $10,431,560.50. Costs are to be taxed against the defendants. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/3/2011. (mab)
November 8, 2010 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 184 Motion for Reconsideration, vacating portion of 182 Order pertaining to Count XX, and refraining from entering judgment on Count XX until the Bankruptcy Court makes a determination as to the interaction between the automatic stay and Count XX. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/8/2010. (mab)
October 27, 2010 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE as to Counts Counts I, II, III, VII, VIII, IX, XIII, XIV, XV,XVI, XVII, XVIII, XX and XXI; and finding that plaintiff P&W is entitled to a net claim of $695,000 plus prejudgment interest from the defendant Allen Boykin. Boykin Trust, Cello, and Jack Boykin are ORDERED to notify the court within thirty (30) days of the resolution of their respective bankruptcy proceedings or lift of stay, whichever occurs first. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/27/2010. (mab)
August 24, 2010 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 92 & 102 Motions for Summary Judgment; denying plaintiff's 122 Motion to Amend Complaint; and finding as moot plaintiff's 106 Motion to Strike certain expert testimony. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 08/24/2010. (mab)
October 16, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court Order, Cello Energy, LLC, Boykin Trust, LLC, and Forest Technologies, LLC are GRANTED leave until November 16, 2009 to retain counsel. If counsel does not appear on behalf of these defendants, default will be entered against those defendants for failure to defend. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/16/2009. (copy to defts) (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parsons & Whittemore Enterprises Corporation v. Cello Energy, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parsons & Whittemore Enterprises Corporation
Represented By: W. Joseph McCorkle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cello Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boykin Trust, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vesta Venture, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack W. Boykin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lois Anne Cowin Boykin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen W. Boykin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elisa Rambo Boykin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?