Clark et al v. Miller et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer Ann Clark and Angela Stevens
Defendant: John Miller, Alan Carpenter, Vincent Hertz and Mobile County
Case Number: 1:2009cv00694
Filed: October 23, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2012 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plf Jennifer Ann Clark's 93 Motion for New Trial as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/4/2012. (tot)
March 17, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Dfts Mobile County, Alan Carpenter, John Miller, Vincent Hertz against Plfs Angela Stevens, Jennifer Ann Clark. Plfs' claims are DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE as set out. Costs are taxed against Plfs. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/17/2011. (tot)
February 25, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 33 & 34 Motions for Summary Judgment. Motions are GRANTED as to plaintiffs' unlawful arrest claims, as to the Section 1983 claims asserted against Mobile County and as to any claims asserted against the officers in their official capacity. In all other respects, the motions for summary judgment are DENIED. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/25/2011. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark et al v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Ann Clark
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Bennitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Stevens
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Bennitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Hertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?