N-Tron Corporation v. Rockwell Automation, Inc.

Plaintiff: N-Tron Corporation
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00733
Filed: November 6, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as set out. Neither the law of the case doctrine nor Wisconsin's economic loss rule entitles Rockwell to Rule 12(c) relief. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/25/2011. Copies to parties. (mpp)
December 30, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 48 MOTION to Amend Answer filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc. Rockwell is ordered by 1/7/2011 to file its amended answer. The style of this action is modified to identify the plaintiff by its new name, WNE Holdings Corporation. The Clerk is directed to make appropriate modifications to the docket sheet to reflect the plaintiff's new name. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/30/2010. (tgw)
February 18, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting the 16 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is ordered by 2/24/2010 to file their amended complaint. The 20 Motion for Leave of Court to File Reply is granted. The 10 Motion to Dismiss, Alternatively Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. The 25 Motion to Strike is moot. The parties are ordered to negotiate and (if necessary) mediate Counts I & II (as set out). This action is STAYED for a period of 90 days. The parties are ordered by 5/17/2010 to file a joint report on the status of the negotiation/mediation efforts. Defendant is ordered to file an answer w/in 10 days after the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 2/18/10. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N-Tron Corporation v. Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N-Tron Corporation
Represented By: Patrick J. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?