Mortensen v. Bank of America Home Loans Servicing et al

Plaintiff: Robert M. Mortensen
Defendant: Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00787
Filed: December 3, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2011 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 99 Motion for Extension of Time to File Civil Appeal Statement with the Court of Appeals. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/12/2011. (tgw)
May 3, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 Motion for Attorney Fees. An award of $111,344.60 in reasonable attorney's fees and $9,651.61 in costs and expenses is properly included in the judgment previously entered in this matter. An amended judgment will beentered contemporaneously herewith. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/3/2011. (tgw)
February 9, 2011 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 84 Motion for Rehearing. Plaintiff's response to defendants' Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses (doc. 82), as supplemented (doc. 85), remains due by February 17, 2011. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/9/2011. (tgw)
December 23, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 64 Defendants' and Counterclaim Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; all claims asserted by plaintiff are dismissed with prejudice because there are no genuine issues of material fact and defendants are entitled to judgment in their favor as to all such cause of action as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/23/10. (mbp)
August 23, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying the 30 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Counter-Claims filed by Robert M. Mortensen. Answer to Counterclaim Complaint is due from Robert M. Mortensen on 9/3/2010. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/23/10. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mortensen v. Bank of America Home Loans Servicing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M. Mortensen
Represented By: Tim W. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Home Loans Servicing
Represented By: Alan Michael Warfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Michael Warfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Michael Warfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?