Taylor et al v. Wal-Mart Stores East L P et al

Plaintiff: Doug Taylor and Tonya Taylor
Defendant: Strongbuilt Inc
Case Number: 1:2009cv00806
Filed: December 10, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: XX US, Outside State
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157(c)(1) Findings, Concl. & Proposed Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of Doug Taylor, Tonya Taylor against Strongbuilt Inc, Strongbuilt International, LLC in the amount of $977,426.60. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/23/2011. (clr)
April 25, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion for Order/extension of time to file application for entry of default and response to show cause. Plaintiffs to file application on or before 5/13/2011. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/25/2011. (cmj)
March 18, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for plaintiffs, Douglas and Tonya Taylor, to file by 3/29/2011, an application pursuant to Rule 55(a)1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for the Clerk to enter default as to defendant Strongbuilt International, LLC, or show cause why an application for entry of default has not been filed. (Show Cause Response due by 3/29/2011.) Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/18/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
February 10, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (docs. 4 & 6) as set out and defendant Strongbuilt, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The automatic stay having been lifted, the Taylors' shall file any motion to amend their complaint to add Strongbuilt International, Inc. as a defendant by 2/24/2010. The Clerk is to enter a Preliminary Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/10/2010. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor et al v. Wal-Mart Stores East L P et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Taylor
Represented By: John W. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Taylor
Represented By: John W. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strongbuilt Inc
Represented By: John P. Kavanagh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?