Charest v. Mitchem

Petitioner: Patrick Joseph Charest
Respondent: Billy Mitchem
Case Number: 1:2010cv00067
Filed: February 11, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2015 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Because the two components of Slack are not satisfied, a COA should not issue. Charest's motions for more briefing (Docs. 102 , 104 ) are DENIED. Additionally, the Court again concludes that in the alternative, the writ is due to be denied because Charest has abused the writ and it is time-barred. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/31/2015. (Attachment: # 1 Appendix A) (copy to petitioner and Clerk of 11th Circuit Court of Appeals) (mab)
November 14, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, Pet's request for habeas corpus relief is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction, or alternatively, DENIED because Charest has abused the writ, & DISMISSED because the petition is time-barred. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/14/2013. (copy mailed to Pet on 11/14/13) (tot)
November 13, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, adopting certain portions and declining to adopt certain portions of the 63 Report and Recommendation; denying as moot 75 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying as moot 76 Motion to Stay; denying requests contained in document 77 ; denying 78 Motion for Recusal of District Judge; and denying petition for abuse of writ and as time barred. Copy by mail to Plaintiff on this date. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/13/2013. (adk)
April 15, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 72 Objection to Report & Recommendation. 70 Order & 71 Judgment are VACATED to allow for consideration of said objection. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/15/2013. (copy mailed to Pet on 4/16/13) (tot)
April 10, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that the Pet's request for habeas corpus relief be dismissed not only as an unconscionable abuse of the writ as set out, but also because it is time-barred as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/10/2013. (copy mailed to Pet on 4/10/1013) (tot)
June 8, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that the present habeas corpus petition be dismissed w/prejudice due to Pet's failure to comply w/28:2244(b)(3)(A). Pet is not entitled to a cert. of appealability &, therefore, is not entitled to appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/8/10. (copy mailed to Pet on 6/9/10) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charest v. Mitchem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patrick Joseph Charest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Billy Mitchem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?