Cunningham v. Culliver et al

Plaintiff: Charles W. Cunningham, Jr.
Defendant: Grantt Culliver, Watson Bishop, C. T. Jenkins, Penton Ashworth, Michael Watson, Christopher Corbitt, Charlie Portis, Joel Broadhead, McCrory Michael, Ernest Stanton, Lareka Brazile, Teddy Montgomery, James Sizemore, Michael Branch, Brandon Carroll, Alphonso Burroughs and Ms. Carroll
Case Number: 1:2010cv00114
Filed: March 8, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
0 Judge: Bert W. Milling
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2013 328 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Grantt Culliver, Watson Bishop, Michael Watson, Charlie Portis, Joel Broadhead, James Sizemore, Alphonso Burroughs, & Nurse Sera Carroll & against Charles W. Cunningham, Jr., as to all Plf's claims, & judgment is enter ed in favor of C. T. Jenkins, Penton Ashworth, Christopher Corbitt, Michael McCrory, Ernest Stanton, Lareka Brazile, Michael Branch & Brandon Carroll as to all Plf's claims asserted against them except Plf's Eighth Amendment excessive fo rce claim as set out. Plf's Eighth Amendment excessive force claim against Dfts C. T. Jenkins, Penton Ashworth, Christopher Corbitt, Michael McCrory, Ernest Stanton, Lareka Brazile, Michael Branch & Brandon Carroll were dismissed w/prejudice as set out. Therefore, all Plf's claims in this matter against Dfts are DISMISSED w/prejudice. Dft Montgomery was dismissed w/o prejudice as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/3/2013. (tot)
September 20, 2013 320 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 318 MOTION Pro Bono Counsel's Motion for Reimbursement from the Special Attorney Admission Fund for Costs Incurred by Charles W. Cunningham, Jr.. The Clerk of Court is hereby authorized to reimburse the law firm of Hand Arendall using funds from the Special Attorney Admissions Fund in the amount of $3,510.51 for costs and expenses. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/20/2013. copy emailed to parties, CRDs, and FINANCE. (sdb)
December 6, 2011 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 229 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Motions for Summary Judgment of Dfts Culliver, Bishop, Watson, Sizemore, Broadhead, Burroughs, Portis & Nurse Carroll are GRANTED as to all claims asserted against them by Plf. Motions for Summary Jud gment of Dfts Jenkins, Ashworth, McCrory, Stanton, Brazile, Branch, Brandon Carroll, and Corbitt are DENIED as to Plf's Eighth Amendment excessive force claim based on the use of the stun shield during the cell extraction & with respect to Plf&# 039;s state law assault and battery claims arising out of Dfts' use of physical force and the use of the stun shield during the cell extraction. With the exception of the claims specified above, Motions for Summary Judgment of Dfts Jenkins, Ashworth, McCrory, Stanton, Brazile, Branch, Brandon Carroll, and Corbitt is GRANTED as to all remaining claims asserted against them by Plf. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/6/2011. (copy mailed to Plf on 12/7/11) (tot)
December 9, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 68 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Plf's 58 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction be denied as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/9/10. copy mailed to plf. (sdb)
November 9, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Plf's 58 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction be denied as set out. Objections to R&R due by 11/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 11/8/10. (copy mailed to Plf on 11/10/10) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Culliver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles W. Cunningham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grantt Culliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. T. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penton Ashworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Corbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Portis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Broadhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCrory Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lareka Brazile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teddy Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sizemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphonso Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?