White-Spunner Construction, Inc. v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: White-Spunner Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company and Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2010cv00158
Filed: April 1, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2011 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 123 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. This action is dismissed without prejudice for want of jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/25/2011. (tgw)
February 28, 2011 114 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 73 MOTION to Intervene filed by Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company. Amerisure is ordered to file its complaint in intervention by 3/4/2011. Any dft seeking to extend its pending motion for summary judgment to cover Amerisure's complaint is ordered to file a statement to that effect by 3/4/2011. If Amerisure seeks to adopt White-Spunner's motion for partial summary judgment and/or briefing in opposition to the dfts' motions for summary judgment, it is ordered to file a statement by 3/4/2011. Any party questioning the Court's subject matter jurisdiction in light of Amerisure's intervention is ordered to file a motion to dismiss by 3/4/2011. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/28/11. copies to parties. (sdb)
August 30, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion to Join Amerisure Insurance as Party; granting in part and denying in part the 12 Motion to Dismiss, 20 Motion to Dismiss, and 24 Motion to Dismiss. The motions to dismiss are granted to the extent they seek a stay o f White-Spunner's claim seeking a declaration that it is entitled to indemnity. That portion of this lawsuit is stayed pending further order of Court. The motions to dismiss are in all other respects denied. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/30/10. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White-Spunner Construction, Inc. v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White-Spunner Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Kile T. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?