Vision Bank v. Algernon Land Company, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: Vision Bank
Defendant: Algernon Land Company, L.L.C. and James Rayfield, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00172
Filed: April 13, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2012 125 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 124 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Vision Bank ; unless defendants Algernon Land Co and James Rayfiled Jr SHOW CAUSE by 3/19/2012, why SE Property should not be substituted for Vision Bank in this case, the motion to substitute is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 3/12/2012. (srr)
April 12, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 69 Rayfield's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 73 Vision Bank's Motion for Summary Judgment with leave to prove damages. Vision Bank is to supplement the record by 4/29/11 with brief which establishes specific amount of damages; Rayfield and Algernon shall respond to Vision Bank's proffer on the issue by 5/13/11. Vision Bank may reply by 5/20/11. Rayfield shall show cause by 4/29/11 whi his claims against Algernon & Herbert ought not be dismissed as a matter of law. The Pretrial Conference set 4/7/11 is continued until further order of this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/12/2011. (srr)
September 23, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 45 Motion to Amend Complaint is GRANTED; It is ORDERED that Mr. Rayfield file his second amended complaint by 10/5/10 and that Vision Bank ANSWER this second amended complaint by 10/19/10. 47 Motion to Strike jury demand is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/23/10. (srr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vision Bank v. Algernon Land Company, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vision Bank
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Algernon Land Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Rayfield, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?