Shade v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Glynis Shade
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2010cv00190
Filed: April 26, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 21 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Glynis Shade that this motion be granted in part and that plaintiff be awarded a reasonable attorney's fee in the amount of $2,981.10.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/28/2011. (cmj)
December 30, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 Unopposed MOTION to Remand Pursuant to Sentence Four filed by Michael J. Astrue. The Defendant's unopposed Motion to Remand is GRANTED, and this matter is reversed and remanded to the Commissioner for action consistent with the Defendant's motion. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/29/2010. (cmj)
December 14, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 Unopposed MOTION to Remand Pursuant to Sentence Four filed by Michael J. Astrue. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that Defendant's unopposed Motion to Remand be GRANTED, and that this Court enter judgment reversing and remanding this cause to the Commissioner for action consistent with the Defendant's motion. Objections to R&R due by 12/28/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/14/10. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shade v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glynis Shade
Represented By: Rose A. McPhillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?