Kaul v. Brett Robinson Gulf Corporation

Plaintiff: Machelle D. Kaul
Defendant: Brett Robinson Gulf Corporation, Larry Stricklin and Lee Smith
Case Number: 1:2010cv00231
Filed: May 4, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2011 85 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendant, Brett Robinson Gulf Corporation, and against plaintiff, Machelle D. Kaul, and attorneys' fees awarded in the amount of $760.50. Plaintiff's claims dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/5/2011. (copy to pltf) (mab)
May 3, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Brett Robinson Gulf Corporation and against Machelle D. Kaul. Plaintiff's claims against the aforementioned defendant are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Costs are to be taxed against the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/3/2011. (copy to pltf) (mab)
November 4, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendant's 32 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/04/2010. (copy to pltf) (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaul v. Brett Robinson Gulf Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Machelle D. Kaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Robinson Gulf Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Stricklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?