Defenders of Wildlife v. Minerals Management Service et al

Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Defendant: Minerals Management Service, United States Department of Interior and Ken Salazar
Case Number: 1:2010cv00254
Filed: May 17, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2012 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 113 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 117 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 118 Motion for Summary Judgment. This action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/8/2012. (tgw)
September 27, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 102 Motion to Intervene of Apache Corporation. Apache is ordered, on or before 10/4/11, to file as a freestanding pleading the proposed answer that it submitted previously. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/26/2011. (mbp)
June 22, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 84 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene filed by Anadarko E&P Company LP. Anadarko is ordered by 6/29/2011 to file as a freestanding pleading the proposed answer found as an Exhibit to its Motion. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/22/2011. (tgw)
May 23, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting in part denying in part 63 , 66 & 68 Motions to Dismiss. All Defendants are ordered to file answers to the Third Amended Complaint by 6/6/2011. Also, the parties are reminded of their responsibility to file their Rule 26(f) report within one week after today's ruling. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/23/2011. (tgw)
December 9, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting the 40 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant filed by Chevron U.S.A., Inc. Chevron is ordered by 12/16/2010 to file the proposed answer. The 36 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by US Oil & Gas Association, Independent Petroleum Association of America, American Petroleum Institute, International Association of Drilling Contractors is moot. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/9/10. (tgw)
August 31, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 38 Joint Motion to Stay Litigation. This action & all deadlines are STAYED. The stay will expire October 13, 2010. The parties are ordered to file a joint status report concerning the status of their settlement negotiations by 10/13/2010. If this action is not settled in its entirety by that time, the parties are ordered to file a joint proposed scheduling order by no later than 10/18/2010. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/31/10. (tgw)
August 9, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting the 16 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants filed by US Oil & Gas Association, Independent Petroleum Association of America, American Petroleum Institute, International Association of Drilling Contractors. The 17 MOTION for Expedited Review is moot. The 29 MOTION to Amend Complaint is granted & plaintiff is ordered by 8/16/2010 to file its Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/9/10. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Defenders of Wildlife v. Minerals Management Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Gilbert Broughton Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minerals Management Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?