Baker et al v. RBS Worldpay, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Chris Baker, Richard Batto and Chris McMeekin
Defendant: RBS Worldpay, Inc., Royal Bank of Scotland, PLC and Citizens Financial Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00307
Filed: June 17, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 71 Bill of Costs filed by RBS Worldpay, Inc. Costs are taxed against plaintiffs in the total amount of $4,244.88, including $4,106.66 for deposition transcript fees plus $138.22 for copies of documents produced to opposing counsel in discovery. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/19/2011. (tgw)
October 4, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/4/2011. (tgw)
October 15, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue; denying 17 Motion for Leave to File Additional Support in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/15/10. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker et al v. RBS Worldpay, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Baker
Represented By: Donald R. James, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Batto
Represented By: Donald R. James, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris McMeekin
Represented By: Donald R. James, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Worldpay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Bank of Scotland, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?