Green v. U.S. Department of Housing & Urban Development et al
Plaintiff: Gary Green
Defendant: U.S. Department of Housing & Urban Development, McFadden Realty and Prichard Housing Authority
Case Number: 1:2010cv00473
Filed: August 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Presiding Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against defendant U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b), Fed.R.Civ.P.. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's remaining claims, and remands this action to the Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/11/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 27 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction at this time. Green is to file an Amended Complaint NLT 12/27/10 as set out. In light of this ruling, the stay of the parties' deadline for filing their report of parties'planning meeting imposed by the Order 30 entered on December 2, 2010 is continued until further notice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/10/10. Copies to parties. (mpp)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying 6 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings & granting 7 Motion to Clarify as set out. Plaintiff's Application for Entry of Default (doc. 12) is denied, without prejudice to plaintiff's ability to renew such application upon a proper evidentiary showing of when, where, and by what method Green contends he served process on the Prichard Housing Authority; provided, further, that any renewed application for default against this defendant must be accompanied bya certificate of service reflecting that Green has mailed a copy of such application to that defendant. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/16/10. Copies to parties on 9/17/10. (mpp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. U.S. Department of Housing & Urban Development et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Housing & Urban Development
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McFadden Realty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prichard Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?