Branch Banking and Trust Company v. The Inn at Dauphin Island, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Defendant: The Inn at Dauphin Island, L.L.C., C. Thurmon Bell, John D. Hunter, Jr. and F. Rutherford Smith, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00498
Filed: September 10, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2012 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 137 response to the Court's order to show cause, which the Court construes as a motion to dismiss defendant C.Thurmon Bell without prejudice. The motion is granted. Bell is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/9/2012. (sdb)
June 26, 2012 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 115 Motion for Summary Judgment. The plaintiff is entitled to judgment on this date against The Inn and Smith in the amount of $2,681,374.40. Judgment shall be entered accordingly by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/26/2012. (tgw)
April 13, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the 33 , 35 & 36 Motions to Dismiss the amended complaint. The defendants' motions to dismiss the original complaint, (Docs. 9, 11, 15, 21), whichwas superseded by the first amended complaint, are denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/13/2011. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch Banking and Trust Company v. The Inn at Dauphin Island, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Represented By: Judson Clark Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Inn at Dauphin Island, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Thurmon Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Hunter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Rutherford Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?