Vision Bank v. Lanza et al

Plaintiff: Vision Bank
Defendant: Louis J. Lanza, III and C. J. Minor
Case Number: 1:2010cv00628
Filed: November 12, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Vision Bank against C. J. Minor, Louis J. Lanza, III in the principal amount of $502,151.67, plus accrued interest in theamount of $59,689.82, and $8,199.96 of other charges and fees, for a total amount of $570,041.45,as of August 18, 2011, with interest continuing to accrue on the principal amount from August 18,2011 until the date of this Judgment in the amount of $97.64 per diem.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/7/2011. (cmj)
November 18, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion to Dismiss Count Two (Counting and Inspection) of Plaintiff's Complaint. Count Two is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/18/2011. (cmj)
November 1, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion for partial Summary Judgment filed by Vision Bank. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/1/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
September 8, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by C. J. Minor, Louis J. Lanza, III. Should the parties not settle their dispute at mediation, responses to 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment due by 10/7/2011. Replies due by 10/14/2011. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/8/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vision Bank v. Lanza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vision Bank
Represented By: Frederick George Helmsing, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis J. Lanza, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. J. Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?