Randall v. Randall et al

Plaintiff: Albert William Randall
Defendant: Ronnie Marion Randall and Bobby Moore
Case Number: 1:2010cv00657
Filed: November 29, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, per Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/24/2011. (cmj)
April 7, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for the parties to file their joint proposed Protective Order by 4/14/2011, or to show cause why they are unable to do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 4/7/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
March 16, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion to Substitute Party. Ray Norris, in his official capacity as Sheriff of Clarke County, Alabama, ishereby SUBSTITUTED as a party defendant in this case in place of Bobby Moore, in his officialcapacity as Sheriff of Clarke County, Alabama. It is further ORDERED that the Plaintiffs claimsagainst Bobby Moore in his personal capacity remain.The CLERK is DIRECTED to add Ray Norris, in his official capacity as Sheriff of ClarkeCounty, Alabama, as a party defendant in this case.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/16/2011. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randall v. Randall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert William Randall
Represented By: Ishmael Jaffree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Marion Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?