Sideridraulic System SPA et al v. Briese Schiffahrts GMBH & Co KG

Plaintiff: Sideridraulic System SPA and ThyssenKrupp Steele USA, LLC
Defendant: Briese Schiffahrts GMBH & Co KG
Counter_claimant: Briese Schiffahrts GMBH & Co KG
Consol_counter_claimant: BBC Chartering & Logistic GmbH & Co. K.G.
Counter_defendant: Sideridraulic System SPA and ThyssenKrupp Steele USA, LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv00715
Filed: December 23, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 56 Amended Motion to Amend Complaint and to Dismiss Sideridraulic System SPA as a Party Plaintiff filed by Sideridraulic System SPA, ThyssenKrupp Steele USA, LLC. Sideridraulic's claims asserted against Briese Schiffahrts are dismiss ed. Plaintiff is ordered by 10/25/2011 to file its First Amended Complaint. The 59 Motion for Sanctions filed by BBC Chartering & Logistic GmbH & Co. K.G., Briese Schiffahrts GMBH & Co KG is denied. (Sideridraulic System SPA terminated as Plaintiff). Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/18/2011. (tgw)
July 26, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time; denying without prejudice 11 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 30 Motion to Supplement the Record. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/26/2011. (tgw)
April 25, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 16 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time for International Service filed by BBC Chartering & Logistic GmbH & Co. K.G., Briese Schiffahrts GMBH & Co KG. BBC and Briese are ordered to file status reports on or before the fourth Tuesday of each month beginning in May. Status Report due by 5/24/2011. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/25/2011. (tgw)
April 20, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 13 MOTION to Set Aside Need for International Service or, Alternatively, Motion for Extension of International Service Period. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/20/2011. (tgw)
March 30, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion to Consolidate. Lead Case No.: 10-0715-WS-M, Member Case No.: 10-0717-N. All future pleadings are to be filed in the Lead Case. The Clerk is directed to extract documents 1-5 from Civil Action No. 10-0717-N and make those documents a part of Civil Action No. 10-0715-WS-M. The Clerk is further directed to statistically close Civil Action No. 10-0717-N. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/30/2011. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sideridraulic System SPA et al v. Briese Schiffahrts GMBH & Co KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briese Schiffahrts GMBH & Co KG
Represented By: John William McClurkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Briese Schiffahrts GMBH & Co KG
Represented By: John William McClurkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_counter_claimant: BBC Chartering & Logistic GmbH & Co. K.G.
Represented By: John William McClurkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Sideridraulic System SPA
Represented By: Thomas E. Sharp, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: ThyssenKrupp Steele USA, LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Sharp, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sideridraulic System SPA
Represented By: Thomas E. Sharp, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ThyssenKrupp Steele USA, LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Sharp, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?