Vision Bank v. The Rookery, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Vision Bank
Defendant: The Rookery, LLC, Gary Paul Peed, Charles Raymond Peed, Joe E. Raley, Richard W. Vail, Richard Long, Joseph Brad Raley, Joseph Scott Raley and Brian Craig Johnson
Case Number: 1:2011cv00014
Filed: January 7, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2013 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 102 Motion to Appoint Process Server. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/22/2013. (tgw)
July 19, 2013 107 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 104 MOTION to Compel filed by SE Property Holdings, LLC.. Defendant Vail is ORDERED to answer plaintiff's post-judgment interrogatories and requests for production of documents by 8/8/2013. Should the defendant fail t o comply with his post-judgment discovery obligations and the contents of this order, he is ORDERED to appear at a Show Cause Hearing set for 8/15/2013 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/19/2013. Order mailed certified mail to Mr. Vail as directed. (Cert Mail # 7012 0470 0001 7154 4883) (sdb)
February 14, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 55 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Vision Bank. Plaintiff is ordered by 2/27/2012 to file its proof of the amount of additional sums, as set out. Eugene and Bradley's Response is due 3/12/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/14/12. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vision Bank v. The Rookery, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vision Bank
Represented By: Frederick George Helmsing, Jr.
Represented By: Archibald T. Reeves, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rookery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Paul Peed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Raymond Peed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe E. Raley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W. Vail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Brad Raley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Scott Raley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Craig Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?