Vision Bank v. Sundance, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Vision Bank
Defendant: Sundance, LLC, Charles H. Trammell, Louis J. Principio, Paul L. Nabors and George S. Braswell
Case Number: 1:2011cv00038
Filed: January 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Order re: 166 Response filed by SE Property Holdings, LLC requesting that George Braswell's request for a hearing be denied. The plaintiff's request, construed as a motion, is denied. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/25/2014. (tgw)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Order granting 76 MOTION to extend the stay to the non-debtor guarantors. This action is now STAYED in all respects. The plaintiff's reporting obligations, (Doc. 65 at 1-2), remain in full force and effect. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/1/2011. (tgw)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 14 Motion for required joinder; denying 16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/28/2011. (tgw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vision Bank v. Sundance, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vision Bank
Represented By: Ashley E. Swink
Represented By: Bradley Robert Sanders, Jr.
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundance, LLC
Represented By: Bert P. Noojin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles H. Trammell
Represented By: Bert P. Noojin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis J. Principio
Represented By: Bert P. Noojin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul L. Nabors
Represented By: Bert P. Noojin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George S. Braswell
Represented By: Bert P. Noojin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?