Lambeth v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Telnia Yoder Lambeth
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2011cv00076
Filed: February 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 JUDGMENT entered dismissing with prejudice all claims of plaintiff Telnia Yoder Lambeth against defendant State Farm. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/6/2012. (cmj)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice per doc. 35. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/4/2012. (cmj)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Motion for Partial Dismissal filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company dismissing plaintiff's bad faith claim with prejudice.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/11/2011. (cmj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lambeth v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telnia Yoder Lambeth
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Robson
Represented By: Ian Avery Brendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Charles Dennis Hughes
Represented By: Felicia A. Long
Represented By: Bert S. Nettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?