Mid-Continent Casualty Company v. Don Brady Construction Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mid-Continent Casualty Company
Defendant: Don Brady Construction Company, Inc., Elizabeth Brady Lindley, Robert Lindley, Donald Brady, Linda Brady and John C. Collins
Case Number: 1:2011cv00088
Filed: February 18, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court Order, the preliminary injunction having been dissolved this date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to return the $500.00 to Starnes Davis Florie LLC as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/21/2013. (tot)
May 7, 2012 102 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Mid-Continent Casualty Company against Don Brady Construction Company, Inc. in the amount of $832,166.13 as further set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/7/2012. copy mailed to Linda Brady (sdb)
February 16, 2012 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plf's 78 Motion to Enforce Order of Contempt as set out, & Don Brady Construction Company is to immediately pay $3,983.00 to Mid-Continent Casualty Company. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/16/12. (copy mailed to Dft L. Brady on 2/16/12) (tot)
June 22, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court Order STAYING this action as to John C. Collins as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/22/2011. (tot)
February 22, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER entered as set out. This Order shall become effective upon the posting of a bond in the amount of $500.00 by Mid-Continent Casualty Company w/o surety. This Order shall expire 14 days hereafter, or at such time as d fts deposit funds or property w/Mid-Continent Casualty Company, unless extended. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 3/4/2011 at 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2B, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 Judge Callie V. S. Granade. Plf is directed to serve this Order on dfts & their counsel. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/22/2011. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mid-Continent Casualty Company v. Don Brady Construction Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Brady Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: William M. Lyon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Brady Lindley
Represented By: Angelique Michelle S. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lindley
Represented By: Angelique Michelle S. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Brady
Represented By: Irvin Grodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-Continent Casualty Company
Represented By: Thomas L. Selden
Represented By: Scott D. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?