Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Parker et al

Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Sharanda Parker, S.M., A.K.M., A.M. and Christian Memorial Funeral Home
Case Number: 1:2011cv00098
Filed: February 22, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2012 104 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL ORDER directing the Clerk to pay the interpleaded funds as set out. The motions to approve payment of attorney's fees (Docs. 98 , 100 , 103 ) are granted. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/14/2012. (Copy to Finance) (tgw)
September 27, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 94 Motion for Default Judgment. This case remains set for Pretrial Conference on 10/16/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/27/2012. (tgw)
October 20, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court Order directing the Plaintiff to Show Cause by 10/27/2011 for its failure to comply with the Court's order to pay funds into the registry of the Court. Plaintiff's request for costs and attorney's fees (Doc. 40), construed as a motion, is denied. The plaintiff will be awarded no attorney's fees or costs in connection with this action. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/20/2011. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Parker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Ann Todd Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharanda Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.M.
Represented By: William Bradford Kittrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.K.M.
Represented By: William Bradford Kittrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.M.
Represented By: William Bradford Kittrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Memorial Funeral Home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?