Dillman v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Marion B. Dillman
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00102
Filed: February 24, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank and dismissing Plaintiff's claims with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/28/2012. (cmj)
August 21, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. It is ORDERED that the parties file by 8/27/2012, a Joint Status Report indicating the status of the class claims as well as any reasons why entry of Final Judgment should not issue for this case. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/21/2012. copy mailed. (sdb)
May 30, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court Order STRIKING 51 Suggestion of Death filed by Marion B. Dillman as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/29/2012. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dillman v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion B. Dillman
Represented By: Earl P. Underwood
Represented By: Kenneth J. Riemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew C. McDonald
Represented By: Tiffany Lin Sorge-Smith
Represented By: Danielle J. Szukala
Represented By: Kenneth A. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?