Oliver et al v. M/V Barbary Coast et al

Cross_defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Marc E. Oliver and Rodd Cairns
Mediator: Benjamen T Rowe
Thirdparty_defendant: Rodd Cairns and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Counter_claimant: Marc E. Oliver, Midsouth Bank, N.A. and M/V Barbary Coast
Counter_defendant: Rodd Cairns, Marc E. Oliver and Midsouth Bank, N.A.
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Atchafalaya Marine, LLC, M/V Barbary Coast and Rodd Cairns
Cross_claimant: Midsouth Bank, N.A.
Intervenor_defendant: Rodd Cairns and M/V Barbary Coast
Case Number: 1:2011cv00223
Filed: May 3, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2013 394 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered that after consideration of the arguments of counsel, the relevant law, and the record as a whole, the Court concludes that based on the foregoing as well as for those reasons stated on the record, National Union's motions (Do cs. 377, 378, 379) are DENIED. As such, it is ORDERED that the jury's verdict, in favor of Atchafalaya, must stand. A Final Judgment consistent with the terms of this Order shall be entered by separate document as required by Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/1/2013. (mca)
January 17, 2013 383 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER conditionally granting 381 Motion to Stay as follows: Execution of judgment is stayed pending further order from this court and defendant shall within 20 days post bond as set out. Should defendant fail to comply, the stay shall be lifted without further notice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/17/2013. (cmj)
November 28, 2012 342 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 318 Motion to Strike by Third-Party Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company, as set out. However, because addresses of Crompton and Thomas were not provided, Third-Party Plaintiff Atchafalaya Marine is to file a Notice of Address for these two witnesses by 11/28/12. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/27/2012. (cmj)
October 5, 2012 301 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 250 Motion for Summary Judgment; 254 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; 270 Motion for Leave to File; finding as moot 265 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 286 Motion to Strike. National Unions Motionfor Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to Rodd Cairns and DENIED as to Count VII(abnormal bad faith) and Count VIII (normal bad faith); and 2) Atchafalaya/Cairns Motion forPartial Summary Judgment is DENIED as to Rodd Cairns and DENIED as to Count VII (abnormal bad faith) and Count VIII (normal bad faith). It is further ORDERED that for those reasons stated on the record at the September 19,2012 summary judgment hearing, the Motion to Strike is MOOT. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/4/2012. (cmj)
September 18, 2012 295 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 283 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 280 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Rodd Cairns. The motion is denied. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/18/2012. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver et al v. M/V Barbary Coast et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Donald C. Radcliff
Represented By: Donald C. Radcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Marc E. Oliver
Represented By: Frank L. Parker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Rodd Cairns
Represented By: Margaret M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Benjamen T Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Rodd Cairns
Represented By: Margaret M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Donald C. Radcliff
Represented By: Donald C. Radcliff
Represented By: Donald C. Radcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Marc E. Oliver
Represented By: Frank L. Parker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Midsouth Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Paul Thomas Beckmann
Represented By: Alex F. Lankford, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: M/V Barbary Coast
Represented By: Margaret M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Rodd Cairns
Represented By: Margaret M. Miller
Represented By: Margaret M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Marc E. Oliver
Represented By: Frank L. Parker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Midsouth Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Alex F. Lankford, III
Represented By: Paul Thomas Beckmann
Represented By: Alex F. Lankford, III
Represented By: Paul Thomas Beckmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Atchafalaya Marine, LLC
Represented By: Margaret M. Miller
Represented By: Margaret M. Miller
Represented By: Margaret M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: M/V Barbary Coast
Represented By: Margaret M. Miller
Represented By: Margaret M. Miller
Represented By: Margaret M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Rodd Cairns
Represented By: Margaret M. Miller
Represented By: Margaret M. Miller
Represented By: Margaret M. Miller
Represented By: Margaret M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Midsouth Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Paul Thomas Beckmann
Represented By: Alex F. Lankford, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Rodd Cairns
Represented By: Margaret M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: M/V Barbary Coast
Represented By: Margaret M. Miller
Represented By: Paul Thomas Beckmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?