United States of America v. Diagnostic Physicians Group, P.C. et al

Defendant: Diagnostic Physicians Group, P.C., IMC-Diagnostic and Medical, P.C., Infirmary Medical Clinics, P.C., Infirmary Health System, Inc. and IMC-Northside Clinic, P.C.
Intervenor: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2011cv00364
Filed: July 8, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2014 365 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 205 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/9/2014. copies to parties. (sdb)
May 22, 2014 305 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 190 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, granting in part and denying in part 57 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Diagnostic Physicians Group, P.C. as follows: 1) The motion is granted as to Count Three against Defendant Diagnostic PhysiciansGroup, P.C.; and2) The motion is denied as to all remaining claims against Defendant DiagnosticPhysicians Group, P.C. as contained in Counts One, Two, Four and Five. The United States' request for 30 days to amend complaint is denied. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/22/2014. (cmj)
May 15, 2014 284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 207 Motion for Reconsideration as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/15/2014. (cmj)
April 11, 2014 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 Motion to Dismiss the Relator's claim for retaliation and wrongful discharge as to the Infirmary Defendants; denying 122 Motion to Amend Complaint as futile; denying as moot 145 Motion to Strike; granting 146 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/11/2014. copies to parties. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Diagnostic Physicians Group, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: United States of America
Represented By: Kavitha J. Babu
Represented By: Steven E. Butler
Represented By: Deidre L. Colson
Represented By: Kimberly Friday
Represented By: Tracy L. Hilmer(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Represented By: Douglas Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diagnostic Physicians Group, P.C.
Represented By: Daniel James Martin
Represented By: Edward A. R. Miller
Represented By: James B. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMC-Diagnostic and Medical, P.C.
Represented By: Windy Cockrell Bitzer
Represented By: Michael P. Matthews
Represented By: Lisa M. Noller
Represented By: Caine O'Rear, III
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Heidi Anne Sorensen(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infirmary Medical Clinics, P.C.
Represented By: Windy Cockrell Bitzer
Represented By: Michael P. Matthews
Represented By: Lisa M. Noller
Represented By: Caine O'Rear, III
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Heidi Anne Sorensen(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infirmary Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Windy Cockrell Bitzer
Represented By: Michael P. Matthews
Represented By: Lisa M. Noller
Represented By: Caine O'Rear, III
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Heidi Anne Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMC-Northside Clinic, P.C.
Represented By: Windy Cockrell Bitzer
Represented By: Michael P. Matthews
Represented By: Lisa M. Noller
Represented By: Caine O'Rear, III
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Heidi Anne Sorensen(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?